Vernet v. Kip
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Vernet
Defendant: James J Kip
Case Number: 2:2021cv00117
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/7/2022 at 11:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 1/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson.Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 4/14/21. (afar)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller & filed on 3/25/21. (ptom, )
March 18, 2021 Refer for 16(b). (jmey, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 COPY OF Timestamped State Court ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by James J Kip.(Coules, Joseph) Modified on 3/18/2021 to edit docket text. (jmey, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel. (jmey, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
March 5, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7658880.), filed by James J Kip. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Cert. of Compliance, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit State Court File, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coules, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernet v. Kip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Vernet
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J Kip
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Coules
Represented By: Thomas Vincent McCarron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?