Wheeler v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Wheeler
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00261
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 5/19/21. (jhie, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Busman, Philip)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, granting #11 Motion for Leave for Exemption from Local Rule 83.1(D). Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated; Plaintiff exempt from local counsel requirements but only for the limited purpose of dismissing this action. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 5/18/21. (jhie, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave for Exemption from Local Rule 83.1(D) by Kyle Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter)(jhie, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Barnes on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Barnes, David)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Busman, Philip)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Busman on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Busman, Philip)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of local counsel requirement emailed to foreign counsel. (jhie, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00099. Original file and docket sheet received.
May 10, 2021 Notification of transfer of civil case from the District of Arizona Case No. 2:19cv99 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
May 7, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Virginia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-99-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16383343 filed by Kyle Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Barnes
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Barnes
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Wheeler
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?