Graves v. Riniti
Plaintiff: Cara Graves
Defendant: Shawn D. Riniti
Case Number: 2:2021cv00316
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Refer for 16(b) (tamarm, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Shawn D. Riniti.(Crandley, John)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit of Compliance by Commonwealth of Virginia, Office of the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles. Shawn D. Riniti served on 6/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(tamarm, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Shawn D. Riniti. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Cara Graves. (Haddad, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Cara Graves. (Haddad, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Cara Graves. (Haddad, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7824782.), filed by Cara Graves. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haddad, Robert)
June 4, 2021 Notice of Correction: Document number 2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form which we have removed. Please refile the document after saving it correctly. (epri, )
June 4, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves v. Riniti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn D. Riniti
Represented By: John George Crandley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Graves
Represented By: Robert John Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?