Walden Jr. v. JPM REAL ESTATE VA, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Walden Jr.
Defendant: JPM REAL ESTATE VA, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00333
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Ronald W. Walden Jr.. (Waters, Deborah)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant's Answer or other pleading in response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before August 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 7/28/21. (mrees, )
July 27, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Krask. #6 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Complaint Out of Time (mrees, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Complaint Out of Time filed by JPM REAL ESTATE VA, L.L.C.. (Ingle, Gilda)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Complaint Out of Time by JPM REAL ESTATE VA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ingle, Gilda)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel. Responsive pleadings have not been filed by the defendant. Plaintiffs counsel is requested to file a status report within 15 days from the date of this Notice. (bpet, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald W. Walden Jr. JPM REAL ESTATE VA, L.L.C. served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021 (Waters, Deborah)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JPM REAL ESTATE VA, L.L.C. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Ronald W. Walden Jr.. (Waters, Deborah)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7835036.), filed by Ronald W. Walden Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waters, Deborah)
June 10, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden Jr. v. JPM REAL ESTATE VA, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Walden Jr.
Represented By: Deborah C. Waters
Represented By: Lindsey Clayton Magee Gordley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPM REAL ESTATE VA, L.L.C.
Represented By: Gilda Bethany Ingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?