Van Emburgh, et al v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Alexis Navarro, Estate of Eleusipa Van Emburgh, by and through its executor Imelda Crovetto, James Alan Van Emburgh, Rafael Navarro, James Michael Van Emburgh, Imelda Crovetto and Amy Rivera
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00357
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(jmey, )
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Andrew David Cherkasky as to Imelda Crovetto, Estate of Eleusipa Van Emburgh, by and through its executor Imelda Crovetto, Alexis Navarro, Rafael Navarro, Amy Rivera, James Michael Van Emburgh and James Alan Van Emburgh. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 7/6/21. (tlev, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Imelda Crovetto, Estate of Eleusipa Van Emburgh, by and through its executor Imelda Crovetto, Alexis Navarro, Rafael Navarro, Amy Rivera, James Michael Van Emburgh, James Alan Van Emburgh. (Beliles, Benjamin)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Imelda Crovetto, Estate of Eleusipa Van Emburgh, by and through its executor Imelda Crovetto, Alexis Navarro, Rafael Navarro, Amy Rivera, James Michael Van Emburgh, James Alan Van Emburgh. (Beliles, Benjamin)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew David Cherkasky and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin A. Beliles by Imelda Crovetto, Estate of Eleusipa Van Emburgh, by and through its executor Imelda Crovetto, Alexis Navarro, Rafael Navarro, Amy Rivera, James Michael Van Emburgh, James Alan Van Emburgh. (Beliles, Benjamin)
June 30, 2021 Notice of Correction re #3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew David Cherkasky and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin A. Beliles Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7862942. The motion does not match the docket entry regarding parties represented. Counsel should refile the motion with the corrected information. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, ) Modified on 6/30/2021 (tlev, ).
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew David Cherkasky and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin A. Beliles Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7862942. by Estate of Eleusipa Van Emburgh, by and through its executor Imelda Crovetto. (Beliles, Benjamin)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Aaron Beliles on behalf of Eleusipa Van Emburgh (Beliles, Benjamin)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7862134.), filed by Eleusipa Van Emburgh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beliles, Benjamin)
June 28, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Emburgh, et al v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Navarro
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Beliles
Represented By: Andrew David Cherkasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Eleusipa Van Emburgh, by and through its executor Imelda Crovetto
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Beliles
Represented By: Andrew David Cherkasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Alan Van Emburgh
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Beliles
Represented By: Andrew David Cherkasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Navarro
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Beliles
Represented By: Andrew David Cherkasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Van Emburgh
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Beliles
Represented By: Andrew David Cherkasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imelda Crovetto
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Beliles
Represented By: Andrew David Cherkasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Rivera
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Beliles
Represented By: Andrew David Cherkasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?