Grunawalt v. Saul
Plaintiff: Bobbi J Grunawalt
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00366
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney General served 8/23/2021 (tamarm, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul and delivered to USM. (Attachments: #1 Motions Procedures, #2 USM 285 forms)(tamarm, )
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue summons, and the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon the defendant(s), as directed by the plaintiff. All cost of service shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 8/5/2021. (tamarm, )
July 1, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons All 3 Proposed Summonses with Form 285s by Bobbi J Grunawalt. (Attachments: #1 Form 285s)(Gillikin, Robert)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #1 Complaint by Bobbi J Grunawalt. (Gillikin, Robert)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Bobbi J Grunawalt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grunawalt v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi J Grunawalt
Represented By: Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?