United States of America v. Cole et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Wendell A. Cole and Tanya M. Cole
Case Number: 2:2021cv00403
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom before District Judge Robert G. Doumar and the Bench Trial is set for 3/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 9/16/21. (lbax, )
September 16, 2021 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference via ZoomGov held on 9/16/2021. Alexander R. Kalyniuk and Anna M. McKenzie appeared for the United States. Wendell A. Cole and Tanya M. Cole appeared as pro se Defendants (lbax, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 09:00 AM via Norfolk Remote. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/25/21. (lbax, )
August 12, 2021 Refer for 16(b) (mrees, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 Sealed Exhibit(s) re #7 Answer to Complaint. (mrees, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Tanya M. Cole, Wendell A. Cole. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(mrees, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America Tanya M. Cole served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021 (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America Wendell A. Cole served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021 (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Tanya M. Cole, Wendell A. Cole. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
July 20, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons as to Tanya M. Cole by United States of America. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons as to Wendell A. Cole by United States of America. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Wendell A. Cole and Tanya M. Cole, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalyniuk, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander R. Kalyniuk
Represented By: Anna M. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya M. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?