Cassidy v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Carson Richard Cassidy
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00409
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2680
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on U.S. Attorney General Merrick Garland on 08/09/2021, filed by Carson Richard Cassidy. (Grana, Stephanie)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carson Richard Cassidy. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 8/3/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Stedman, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2021 Notice of Correction re #7 Affidavit of Service. Document number 7 was filed using the wrong docket event. The correct event that should have been selected is Summons Returned Executed. Please advise, a summons returned executed should include a copy of the summons served in addition to the proof of service. Please refile using the Summons Returned Executed event. (mrees, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on U.S. Attorney Raj Parekh on 08/03/2021, filed by Carson Richard Cassidy. (Stedman, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Two (2) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedure)(mrees, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney Raj Parekh by Carson Richard Cassidy. (Stedman, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney General Merrick Garland by Carson Richard Cassidy. (Stedman, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2021 Notice of Correction re 3 Proposed Summons, 2 Proposed Summons. Unfortunately, document numbers 2 and 3 are incorrectly saved as PDF fillable form which we have removed. Please refile the document after saving it correctly. To correctly save the PDF fillable form, click on the File menu select Print, and then select your PDF writer from the Printer Name List, then click on Print or OK depending on your program. (mrees, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General by Carson Richard Cassidy. (Grana, Stephanie)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Raj Parekh, U.S. Attorney by Carson Richard Cassidy. (Grana, Stephanie)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7904912.), filed by Carson Richard Cassidy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Grana, Stephanie)
July 22, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cassidy v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carson Richard Cassidy
Represented By: Elliott Matthew Buckner
Represented By: Jeffrey Neil Stedman
Represented By: Michael Scott Bucci
Represented By: Stephanie Elaine Grana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?