Miller et al v. Farley
Plaintiff: Eluster Miller and Angela W Miller
Defendant: Newton Wesley Farley
Case Number: 2:2021cv00498
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eluster Miller, Angela W Miller.(Telfair, Brian)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K. Telfair on behalf of Angela W Miller, Eluster Miller (Telfair, Brian)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss. This case was transferred without opposition from the District of South Carolina; upon acceptance of transfer, this Court strikes previously pending motions without prejudice. Defendant is given leave to appear, answer, or file a renewed motion to dismiss no later than October 8, 2021. Counsel are DIRECTED to confer and contact this Court's Courtroom Deputy for purposes of setting a Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 09/22/2021. (Allen, Arenda)
September 10, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of local counsel requirement to foreign counsel. (dbra, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 7:21-cv-02241. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint to allege damages in this action exceed $75,000; granting #9 Consent Motion to Change Venue, to the US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, Norfolk Division. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/7/21.(kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/9/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint ( Response to Motion due by 9/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ), Consent MOTION to Change Venue by Angela W Miller, Eluster Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Anthony, Kenneth) Modified on 9/3/2021 to add linkage (alew, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/9/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2021. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/24/21. (sfla) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/9/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Eluster Miller, Angela W Miller. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Anthony, Kenneth) Modified on 8/25/2021: to add filer as listed (kmca). [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/9/2021.]
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Newton Wesley Farley. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Newton Wesley Farley)No proposed order.(Still, Patrick) Modified on 8/12/2021: to add text (name on affidavit) (kmca). [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/9/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Newton Wesley Farley. (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/9/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Angela W Miller, Eluster Miller.(kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/9/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Newton Wesley Farley (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9974706), filed by Eluster Miller, Angela W Miller. Service due by 10/20/2021.(kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eluster Miller
Represented By: Kenneth C Anthony, Jr
Represented By: Brian K. Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela W Miller
Represented By: Kenneth C Anthony, Jr
Represented By: Brian K. Telfair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton Wesley Farley
Represented By: Patrick Laverne Still, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?