Samaan v. Sentara Princess Anne ER
Plaintiff: Rami E Samaan
Defendant: Sentara Princess Anne ER
Case Number: 2:2021cv00601
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
2 Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION REQUESTING BRIEFS ARGUMENT filed by Rami E Samaan. (epri, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Sentara Princess Anne ER for ruling on Motion to Dismiss based on briefs (Carrier, Jordan)
December 27, 2021 Filing 12 Brief in Support of Motion to Continue filed by Rami E Samaan. (epri, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Standing with Roseboro,. filed by Sentara Princess Anne ER. (Carrier, Jordan)
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Taylor Carrier on behalf of Sentara Princess Anne ER (Carrier, Jordan)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Taylor Carrier on behalf of Sentara Princess Anne ER (Carrier, Jordan)
December 17, 2021 Notice of Correction: Document number 9 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form which we have removed. Please refile the document after saving it correctly. (epri, )
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 Brief in support of Motion to Continue by Rami E Samaan. (epri, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Standing with Roseboro,. filed by Sentara Princess Anne ER. (Burton, Dorinda)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Standing with Roseboro,. by Sentara Princess Anne ER. (Burton, Dorinda)
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sentara Princess Anne ER. (Burton, Dorinda)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorinda Parkola Burton on behalf of Sentara Princess Anne ER (Burton, Dorinda)
November 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Princess Anne ER, served on 11/11/2021. (epri, )
November 4, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask no longer assigned to the case. (epri, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 One Summons Issued as to Sentara Princess Anne ER. Service packet mailed to Plaintiff on 11.3.21. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sentara Princess Anne ER ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 24683049956.), filed by Rami E Samaan. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samaan v. Sentara Princess Anne ER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rami E Samaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentara Princess Anne ER
Represented By: Dorinda Parkola Burton
Represented By: Jordan Taylor Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?