Dickerson v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Shelby Dickerson
Defendant: Monsanto Company and John Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2021cv00671
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Notice of Correction re #6 Affidavit of Service. This case was transferred to the Northern District of California on 2/1/2022. Any documents pertaining to this case should be filed in that District. (jhie, )
February 21, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Rene Nordquist on 01/18/2022, filed by Shelby Dickerson. (Weykamp, Paul)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 Certified Copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2741, transferring specified actions to the Northern District of California. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel. Certified copy received in EDVA, Norfolk Division, from Northern District of California on 2/1/22. (jhie, )
February 1, 2022 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California. (jhie, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Shelby Dickerson. (Weykamp, Paul)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Shelby Dickerson. (Weykamp, Paul)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8171721.), filed by Shelby Dickerson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Weykamp, Paul)
December 28, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
December 28, 2021 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified that document (1-1), Civil Cover Sheet is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Dickerson
Represented By: Paul A. Weykamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?