Mulvey v. United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Plaintiff: John Albert Mulvey
Defendant: United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 2:2022cv00076
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISMISSAL ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss, ECF No. 5, is GRANTED, and this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Copies of Order sent as DIRECTED on 3.23.22. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 3/23/22. (epri, )
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Albert Mulvey (epri, )
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Veteran Affairs, served on 2/28/2022. (epri, )
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Veteran Affairs, via US Atty, served on 2/23/2022. (epri, )
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Veteran Affairs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Motion Procedures)(afar)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veteran Affairs ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 24683050805) filed by John Albert Mulvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Receipt)(afar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulvey v. United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Albert Mulvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?