Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al v. Eastern Constructors, Inc
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN000894, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-007, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948 and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074
Defendant: Eastern Constructors, Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00084
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant Eastern Constructors shall have until April 25, 2022 to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 4/18/2022. (dbra, )
April 15, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Answer or otherwise Respond (dbra, )
April 14, 2022 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support re #25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Answer or otherwise Respond filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
April 14, 2022 Filing 25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Answer or otherwise Respond by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, David)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 3/23/2022. (dbra, )
March 22, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Answer or otherwise Respond (dbra, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 23 Memorandum to #22 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Answer or otherwise Respond filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
March 21, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Answer or otherwise Respond by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, David)
March 17, 2022 Notice of Correction - An incorrect filing event was used on ECF #21. Proof of service should be filed using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted as instructed in ECF #13. No further action is needed at this time as the clerks office will correct the filing. (dbra, )
March 15, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, (Rosenblum, David) Modified on 3/17/2022 (dbra, ).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sean Patrick O'Donnell as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 3/1/22. (tlev, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice for Steven Kessel Gerber as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 3/1/22. (tlev, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 18 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean O' Donnell and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 28, 2022 Notice of Correction re #17 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean O' Donnell and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
February 25, 2022 Filing 17 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean O' Donnell and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 25, 2022 Filing 16 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven K. Gerber and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 25, 2022 Notice of Correction re #15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean O' Donnell and #14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven K. Gerber and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum. The motions do not match the docket entries regarding parties represented. The motion for Sean O'Donnell should be signed by local counsel. Counsel should re-file the motions with the corrected information. Counsel should not pay the fees a second time. (tlev, )
February 24, 2022 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean O' Donnell and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8262603. by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven K. Gerber and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8262601. by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Eastern Constructors, Inc, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
February 24, 2022 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948. (Rosenblum, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074. (Rosenblum, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 24, 2022 Notice of Correction re 3 Financial Disclosure Statement, 6 Financial Disclosure Statement, 7 Financial Disclosure Statement, 4 Financial Disclosure Statement, 5 Financial Disclosure Statement. Document numbers (3-7) are incorrectly saved PDF fillable forms which we have removed. Please refile the documents after saving them correctly. (epri, )
February 23, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN000894. (Rosenblum, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-007. (Rosenblum, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8260228.), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN000894, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-007, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenblum, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al v. Eastern Constructors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Donnell
Represented By: Steven Kessel Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everest Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Donnell
Represented By: Steven Kessel Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Donnell
Represented By: Steven Kessel Gerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN000894
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-007
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. CSN0008948
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Donnell
Represented By: Steven Kessel Gerber
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London Subscribing to Policy No. 20-SBR-0074
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Donnell
Represented By: Steven Kessel Gerber
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Constructors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?