B.T. v. Silver Diner Development, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: B. T.
Defendant: Silver Diner Development, Inc., Silver Diner Development, LLC., Silver Diner Limited Partnership and James H. Haliburton
Case Number: 2:2022cv00094
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE to Plaintiff's Counsel of Record (dbra, )
April 15, 2022 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by B. T. James H. Haliburton served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022 (Biniazan, Kevin)
April 6, 2022 Filing 29 Request for Hearing by B. T. re #25 Response in Opposition to Motion To Dismiss (Biniazan, Kevin)
April 5, 2022 Filing 28 Letter Regarding Ripeness of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. (Radovic, Milena)
April 5, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Silver Diner Development, LLC.. (Radovic, Milena) Modified link to proper Motion to Dismiss on 4/7/2022 (dbra, ).
April 5, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Strike filed by Silver Diner Development, LLC.. (Radovic, Milena)
March 30, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by B. T.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B.T.)(Biniazan, Kevin)
March 30, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Strike filed by B. T.. (Biniazan, Kevin)
March 30, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by B. T.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biniazan, Kevin)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff must file her Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike no later than March 30, 2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 3/24/2022. (dbra, )
March 24, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by B. T.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biniazan, Kevin)
March 10, 2022 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION to Strike filed by Silver Diner Development, LLC.. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 10, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike by Silver Diner Development, LLC.. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 10, 2022 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Silver Diner Limited Partnership. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 10, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Silver Diner Limited Partnership. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 10, 2022 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Silver Diner Development, Inc.. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 10, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Silver Diner Development, Inc.. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 10, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Silver Diner Development, LLC.. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 10, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Silver Diner Development, LLC.. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by Silver Diner Limited Partnership re #1 Notice of Removal (Radovic, Milena)
March 3, 2022 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Silver Diner Limited Partnership. (Radovic, Milena)
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Silver Diner Development, LLC.. (Radovic, Milena)
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Silver Diner Development, Inc.. (Radovic, Milena)
March 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Milena Radovic on behalf of Silver Diner Development, LLC. (Radovic, Milena)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Milena Radovic on behalf of Silver Diner Limited Partnership (Radovic, Milena)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Milena Radovic on behalf of Silver Diner Development, Inc. (Radovic, Milena)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina H. Vaquera on behalf of Silver Diner Limited Partnership (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina H. Vaquera on behalf of Silver Diner Development, LLC. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina H. Vaquera on behalf of Silver Diner Development, Inc. (Vaquera, Kristina)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8273287.), filed by Silver Diner Development, LLC., Silver Diner Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Radovic, Milena)
March 3, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.T. v. Silver Diner Development, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. T.
Represented By: Kevin Biniazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Diner Development, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina H. Vaquera
Represented By: Milena Radovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Diner Development, LLC.
Represented By: Kristina H. Vaquera
Represented By: Milena Radovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Diner Limited Partnership
Represented By: Kristina H. Vaquera
Represented By: Milena Radovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Haliburton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?