Turner v. Rosenberg
Plaintiff: Rhea Christine Turner
Defendant: David E. Rosenberg and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00195
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISMISSAL ORDER. Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff with the consent of Defendant, this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/16/22. (jhie, )
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rhea Christine Turner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weinberg, Matthew)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (2020-10-07 Letter), #2 Exhibit B (2020-10-26 Letter), #3 Exhibit C (2021-04-09 Letter), #4 Exhibit D (2021-06-16 Letter), #5 Exhibit E (Declaration of Karen Sicard))(Shean, Daniel)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Shean, Daniel)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Substitution of Defendant (Shean, Daniel)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Removal , filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Deeming Letter), #3 Exhibit C (Certification), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shean, Daniel)
May 6, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhea Christine Turner
Represented By: Barry Randolph Koch
Represented By: Matthew James Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Shean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?