Banilla Games et al v. Hines
Plaintiff: Banilla Games and Grover Gaming, Inc.
Defendant: Russell Charles Hines
Case Number: 2:2022cv00212
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
2 Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Russell Charles Hines, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for failure to file an answer in this action. This default is noted on the Court's docket this date. (epri, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Russell Charles ("Charlie") Hines by Banilla Games, Grover Gaming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Faraci, Stephen)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banilla Games, Grover Gaming, Inc. Russell Charles Hines served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022 (Faraci, Stephen)
May 19, 2022 Case Reassigned to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith. District Judge Roderick C. Young no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Grover Gaming, Inc.. (Faraci, Stephen)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Banilla Games. (Faraci, Stephen)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Russell Charles Hines, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Banilla Games, Grover Gaming, Inc.. (Faraci, Stephen)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Banilla Games, Grover Gaming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian Brown)(Faraci, Stephen)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Proposed Summons to Russell Charles Hines by Banilla Games, Grover Gaming, Inc.. (Faraci, Stephen)
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint Verified Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8392861.), filed by Banilla Games, Grover Gaming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Faraci, Stephen)
May 17, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banilla Games et al v. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banilla Games
Represented By: Robert Drewry
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Faraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grover Gaming, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Drewry
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Faraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Charles Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?