United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC v. Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC
Defendant: Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00364
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 0270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The Court ORDERS this action stayed in its entirety. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the case. The parties shall submit status updates. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 9/13/2022. (dbra, )
September 12, 2022 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. (Rothman, Shoshana)
September 12, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. (Rothman, Shoshana) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2022: #1 Proposed Order) (dbra, ).
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Limited Appearance of Counsel by Kyle Russell Hosmer on behalf of Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Hosmer, Kyle) Text Modified on 9/13/2022 (dbra, ).
September 7, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/30/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Rothman, Shoshana)
September 7, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Rothman, Shoshana)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rothman, Shoshana)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on 08/30/2022 by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. Waiver of Service due by 9/29/2022. (Rothman, Shoshana)
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC on 08/30/2022 by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. Waiver of Service due by 9/29/2022. (Rothman, Shoshana)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
August 30, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. (Rothman, Shoshana)
August 30, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. (Rothman, Shoshana)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8547731.), filed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothman, Shoshana)
August 30, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC v. Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Caddell Construction Co. (DE), LLC
Represented By: Shannon Jill Briglia
Represented By: Shoshana Elise Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Government Systems, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Russell Hosmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle Russell Hosmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?