Gutierrez v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Gutierrez
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Marine Hydraulics International, LLC doing business as MHI SHIP REPAIR AND SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2022cv00556
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (DEFENDANT MHI'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) by Marine Hydraulics International, LLC.(Abel, Christopher)
February 7, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Gutierrez.(Vpea)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and treats Plaintiff's attached First Amended Complaint as FILED the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 2/7/2023. (Vpea)
February 6, 2023 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Anthony Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Pl First Amended Complaint)(Biniazan, Kevin)
February 2, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amelia Anne Gilmer on behalf of Marine Hydraulics International, LLC (Gilmer, Amelia)
January 25, 2023 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Marine Hydraulics International, LLC. (Abel, Christopher)
January 25, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Marine Hydraulics International, LLC.(Abel, Christopher)
January 25, 2023 Filing 10 Brief in Support to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marine Hydraulics International, LLC. (Abel, Christopher)
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Marine Hydraulics International, LLC. (Abel, Christopher) Modified on 2/7/2023 (Vpea).
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Gutierrez Marine Hydraulics International, LLC served on 1/6/2023, answer due 1/27/2023 (Biniazan, Kevin)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Gutierrez. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 1/6/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Biniazan, Kevin)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Gutierrez. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 1/10/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Biniazan, Kevin)
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Marine Hydraulics International, LLC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
December 27, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Anthony Gutierrez. (Biniazan, Kevin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Anthony Gutierrez. (Biniazan, Kevin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Anthony Gutierrez. (Biniazan, Kevin)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8726880.), filed by Anthony Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biniazan, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gutierrez
Represented By: Kevin Biniazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Hydraulics International, LLC doing business as MHI SHIP REPAIR AND SERVICES
Represented By: Amelia Anne Gilmer
Represented By: Christopher Alan Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?