Gray v. Mid-Atlantic Women's Care, P.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Allison Nicole Gray
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Womens Care, PLC, doing business as Womancare Centers, PLC, Toiyana Rodgers, CNM and Sentara Hospitals doing business as Sentara Leigh Hospital
Case Number: 2:2024cv00690
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Allison Nicole Gray as to All Defendants. (Haddad, Robert)
January 13, 2025 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allison Nicole Gray. Mid-Atlantic Womens Care, PLC, waiver sent on 12/30/2024, answer due 2/28/2025. (Haddad, Robert)
January 13, 2025 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allison Nicole Gray. Toiyana Rodgers, CNM waiver sent on 12/30/2024, answer due 2/28/2025. (Haddad, Robert)
January 13, 2025 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allison Nicole Gray. Sentara Hospitals waiver sent on 12/30/2024, answer due 2/28/2025. (Haddad, Robert)
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motion Procedures)(Vpea)
December 12, 2024 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Allison Nicole Gray (Haddad, Robert)
December 12, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Allison Nicole Gray (Haddad, Robert)
December 12, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Allison Nicole Gray (Haddad, Robert)
November 25, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
November 25, 2024 Filing 2 Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Allison Nicole Gray. (Haddad, Robert)
November 25, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9868507.), filed by Allison Nicole Gray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haddad, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Mid-Atlantic Women's Care, P.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Nicole Gray
Represented By: Robert John Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Womens Care, PLC, doing business as Womancare Centers, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toiyana Rodgers, CNM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentara Hospitals doing business as Sentara Leigh Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?