Riches v. Vick Featured Case

Prisoner Johnathan Lee RichesĀ© seeks $63 billion backed by gold and silver delivered via UPS from Michael Vick for allegedly stealing his two pit bulls and using them for dog fighting. Prisoner also alleges that Vick damaged the RFID chips in the plaintiff's dog collars, sold plaintiff's dogs on eBay and used the proceeds to purchase missiles from the Iran Government. Plaintiff also alleges that Michael Vick subjected him to microwave testing.

Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Defendant: Michael Vick
Case Number: 3:2007cv00434
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Hudson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Pltf failed to return a completed ifp affidavit form and consent to collection of fees form; Appeal within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/11/2007. (cgar, )
October 12, 2007 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/11/2007. (cgar, )
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of USCA Court dismisses appeal for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 45 as to 7 8 Notice of Interlocutory Appeals filed by Jonathan Lee Riches. (cgar, )
August 31, 2007 Filing 14 4th Circuit letter to Appellant. (cgar, )
August 31, 2007 Filing 13 USCA Case Number 7-7267, Case Manager: Anthony Webb, 4th Circuit Court of Appeals for 7 8 Notices of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Jonathan Lee Riches. (cgar, )
August 27, 2007 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's name by Jonathan Lee Riches. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tdai, )
August 27, 2007 Filing 11 MOTION for Clarification re 3 Memorandum Order, by Jonathan Lee Riches. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tdai, )
August 22, 2007 Filing 10 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Memorandum Order and certified Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 8 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (lbre, )
August 22, 2007 Filing 9 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Memorandum Order and certified Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (lbre, )
August 21, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 3 Memorandum Order, by Jonathan Lee Riches. No fee received. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tdai, )
August 21, 2007 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 3 Memorandum Order, by Jonathan Lee Riches. No fee recieved. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tdai, )
August 15, 2007 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement received from F.C.I. Williamsburg. (tdai, )
August 6, 2007 Filing 5 MOTION for Disclosure by Jonathan Lee Riches. (tdai, )
August 6, 2007 Filing 4 MOTION for Recusal by Jonathan Lee Riches. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tdai, )
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER that this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account for 6 month period immediately proceeding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. See Order for more details. Copies mailed: Yes. Signed by Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 8/1/07. (tdai, )
July 23, 2007 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (within body of prisoner complaint) by Jonathan Lee Riches. (tdai, )
July 23, 2007 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Michael Vick, filed by Jonathan Lee Riches. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(tdai, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riches v. Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?