Richardson v. Virginia Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Gregory A. Richardson
Respondent: Virginia Department of Corrections, Virginia Parole Board and Warden of Sussex I State Prison
Case Number: 3:2007cv00514
Filed: November 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Sussex
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Payne
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/30/2021. Copy mailed to Petitioner. (walk, )
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/14/10. Copy sent: Yes(tdai, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 5/12/10. (jtho, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/5/2010. (cgar)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/7/09. Copy sent: Yes (tdai, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Virginia Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Virginia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Virginia Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Sussex I State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?