Williams v. Fahey Featured Case
Petitioner: Danial J. Williams
Respondent: Helen Fahey
Case Number: 3:2009cv00769
Filed: December 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Williams
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2010 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Stay AND HOLD FEDERAL HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDINGS IN ABEYANCE PENDING EXHAUSTION OF STATE REMEDIES filed by Danial J. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Warren)
July 9, 2010 Filing 27 Brief in Support to 26 Objection to Petitioner's Motion to Stay and Hold Proceedings in Abeyance filed by Helen Fahey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Theisen, Virginia)
July 9, 2010 Filing 26 Objection to Petitioner's Motion to Stay and Hold Proceedings in Abeyance filed by Helen Fahey. (Theisen, Virginia)
June 29, 2010 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re 24 MOTION to Stay AND HOLD FEDERAL HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDINGS IN ABEYANCE PENDING EXHAUSTION OF STATE REMEDIES filed by Danial J. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Allen, Warren)
June 29, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay AND HOLD FEDERAL HABEAS CORPUS PROCEEDINGS IN ABEYANCE PENDING EXHAUSTION OF STATE REMEDIES by Danial J. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
June 15, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE by Helen Fahey Notice of Decision of the US Supreme Ct (Theisen, Virginia)
April 28, 2010 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Helen Fahey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Theisen, Virginia)
April 23, 2010 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Danial J. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Allen, Warren)
April 9, 2010 Filing 20 Brief in Support to 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Helen Fahey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Theisen, Virginia)
April 9, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Helen Fahey. (Theisen, Virginia)
March 8, 2010 Filing 18 Response to 14 Order, filed by Danial J. Williams. (Allen, Warren) Modified text on 3/9/2010 (tdai, ).
March 3, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Bidwell Theisen on behalf of Helen Fahey (Theisen, Virginia)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SO-ORDER granting 15 Motion for Michael Gordon Tierney to appear Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 3/2/10. (jtho, )
March 1, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION for Michael Gordon Tierney to appear Pro hac vice by Danial J. Williams. (Fee Paid; Receipt #14683011823) (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(jtho, )
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER that Petitioner, by counsel, submitted this 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition. The Court informed Petitioner that any amended Petition could not exceed fifty pages in length (inclusive of the affidavit from Petitioner). On January 22, 2010, the Court granted Petitioner's request to exceed the page limit and submit a seventy-five page petition. On January 29, 2010, Petitioner filed an amended petition (hereinafter the "Amended Petition"). The Amended Petition is not compliance with the directives of the Court (see order for details). Within twenty (20) days of the date of entry hereof, Petitioner is directed to provide a brief explanation as to why his petition is not barred the statute of limitations. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve Respondent. Service shall be made by mailing a copy of this Memorandum Order, with the petition attached, to the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Virginia. Within fifteen (15) days of the date of entry hereof, the Attorney General shall file an appearance in this matter. If Respondent wishes to pursue a statute of limitations defense to the Amended Petition, he should do so by a motion to dismiss, prior to filing the answer required by Rule 5 of the Rules Governing § 2254 Cases in the U.S. District Courts. Any such motion to dismiss and accompanying brief shall be filed with fifty (50) days of the date of entry hereof. An answer to the Amended Petition shall be filed by later of sixty (60) days from the date of entry hereof, or thirty (30) days after the denial of a motion to dismiss based upon the statute of limitations. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 2/19/10. Copy sent: Yes as directed. (tdai, )
February 3, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE by Danial J. Williams re 12 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus OF REVISED APPENDICES (Attachments: # 1 Appendix I - Timeline of Key Events, # 2 Appendix II - Affidavit of Danial Williams)(Allen, Warren) Modified text on 2/4/2010 (tdai, ).
January 29, 2010 Filing 12 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (CORRECTED) re: 2 Memorandum Order by Danial J. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Verification of Danial J. Williams, # 2 Appendix I, # 3 Appendix II)(Allen, Warren) Modified text on 2/2/2010 (tdai, ). Modified text on 2/4/2010 (tdai, ).
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages totaling 75 pages in length. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 1/22/10. (jtho, )
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO-ORDER granting 8 Motion for Donald Paul Salzman to appear Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 1/21/10. (jtho, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Pro hac vice; Appointed Albert A Starkus, III for Danial J. Williams. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 1/20/2010. (cgar)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SO-ORDER granting 5 Motion for Julia Mara Kazaks to appear Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 1/15/2010. (jtho, )
January 14, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for Donald Paul Salzman to appear Pro hac vice by Danial J. Williams. (Received corrected Pro Hac application on 1/20/10) Fee Paid; Receipt 34683006742) (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(jtho, )
January 14, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION for Julia Mara Kazaks to appear Pro hac vice by Danial J. Williams. (jtho, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2010: # 1 Receipt) (jtho, ).
January 11, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Albert A. Starkus, III to appear hac vice by Danial J. Williams. (Fee paid; Receipt #34683006700) (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(jtho, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Danial J. Williams. (Allen, Warren)
January 8, 2010 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Danial J. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Warren)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER that the petition is FILED. Petitioner is directed, within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof, to submit a petition that complies with the requirements set forth in the order. The entire petition shall not exceed fifty pages in length. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 12/30/09. Copy sent: Yes as directed(tdai, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 14683010244.), filed by Danial J. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt, # 3 Appendix)(tdai, ) Modified file date on 12/10/2009 (tdai, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danial J. Williams
Represented By: Warren Thomas Allen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Helen Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?