Dixon v. Clark
Petitioner: Marcus Le'Shawn Dixon
Respondent: Harold W. Clark
Case Number: 3:2012cv00429
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Wise
Presiding Judge: James R. Spencer
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 11/23/2021. (jpow, )
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION. See Opinion for details. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 2/21/2019. (sbea, )
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Read Opinion for complete details. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 06/08/2018. Copy mailed to Petitioner as directed.(ccol, )
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 9/11/13. Copy sent: Yes(tdai, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Le'Shawn Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harold W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?