Porter v. Pearson

Petitioner: Thomas Alexander Porter
Respondent: Eddie L. Pearson
Case Number: 3:2012cv00550
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Richmond Office
County: Sussex
Presiding Judge: James R. Spencer
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. See for complete details. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 09/22/2016. (nbrow)
April 25, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. See for complete details. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 04/25/2016. (nbrow)
October 16, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10/16/2014. Copies to all counsel of record.(jsmi, ) (Main Document 81 replaced on 10/16/2014) (tdai, ).
August 21, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 8/21/14. (tdai, )
March 20, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 3/20/14. (tdai, )
May 2, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 5/2/13. (kyou, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Alexander Porter
Represented By: Trey Robert Kelleter
Represented By: Robert Edward Lee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eddie L. Pearson
Represented By: Matthew P. Dullaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?