Liverman et al v. City of Petersburg et al

Plaintiff: Herbert E. Liverman and Vance R. Richards
Defendant: City of Petersburg and John I. Dixon, III
Case Number: 3:2014cv00139
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Richmond Office
County: Chesterfield
Presiding Judge: James R. Spencer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 9/9/2015. Memorandum Opinion was electronically sent to all counsel of record. (sbea, )
September 1, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 9/1/2015. Memorandum Opinion was sent to all counsel of record. (sbea, )
May 6, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 5/6/2015. (sbea, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liverman et al v. City of Petersburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert E. Liverman
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Bodoh
Represented By: Thomas Hunt Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance R. Richards
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Bodoh
Represented By: Thomas Hunt Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Petersburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John I. Dixon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?