Limelight Networks, Inc. v. XO Communications, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Limelight Networks, Inc.
Defendant: XO Communications, LLC and Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00720
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: John A. Gibney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 652 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SEE OPINION for complete details. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 03/23/2018. Copy electronically submitted to counsel as directed.(ccol, )
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 OPINION. See Opinion for details. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 2/2/2018. (sbea, )
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 OPINION. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/19/2018. (walk, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 418 Order. See for complete details. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 03/13/2017. (nbrow)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Limelight Networks, Inc. v. XO Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limelight Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Maya Miriam Eckstein
Represented By: Paul Tsutomu Ehrlich
Represented By: Aaron Matthew Nathan
Represented By: William Patrick Nelson
Represented By: Matthew D. Powers
Represented By: Natasha Marusja Saputo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XO Communications, LLC
Represented By: JC Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?