Owens v. Lucas et al

Plaintiff: Terry Owens
Defendant: Deputy Lucas, Deputy Hill and Sergeant Spain
Case Number: 3:2018cv00596
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 7 Featured Case FINAL ORDER that this matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal (ECF No. #6 ) filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). It appearing just and proper to do so, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all Defendants. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 09/28/2018. (walk, )
September 27, 2018 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Terry Owens. (McBeth, Isaac)
September 18, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 09/18/2018. (tjoh, )
September 17, 2018 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Duces Tecum (Time-Sensitive) filed by Terry Owens. (McBeth, Isaac)
September 17, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to File Subpoena Duces Tecum (Time-Sensitive) by Terry Owens. (McBeth, Isaac)
August 29, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Deputy Lucas, Deputy Hill, and Sergeant Spain. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove headers and print out two copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Serve one copy of the summons and one copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the additional copy of the summons for each Defendant (executed or unexecuted) on paper to the Clerk's Office. (sbea, )
August 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terry Owens against Deputy Lucas, Deputy Hill, and Sergeant Spain (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6249185). (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (sbea, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Owens
Represented By: Isaac Abraham McBeth
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?