Lamberson v. Wytheville Police Department et al
Plaintiff: David Allen Lamberson
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Wythe County, Virginia, Gerald E. Mabe, II, Scot S. Farthing, Jane Doe 3, Rick Arnold, Crystal Vaught, David Akers, B.G. 'Gene' Horney, Jr., Wythe County, Wytheville Police Department, Stephen D. Bear, R. Cellell Dalton, Joel Hash, Misty E. Dalton, John Doe 3, Gary Houseman, Jennifer Brewster, Coy L. McRoberts, Tiffany Sexton, Town of Wytheville, Jane Doe 1, Wayne C. Sutherland, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2, Robert Akers, Rhonda Vaught, Rebecca Akers, John Doe 4, John Doe 1, Dewey Clemons, Jr. and David S. Saliba
Case Number: 3:2018cv00677
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Remark: Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in Western District of Virginia as case 7:18-cv-00534, filed 10/29/2018. (tjoh, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. In the interest of justice and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), the Court GRANTS the defendants' motions to the extent they seek transfer of venue (Dk. Nos. 12, 20, 27), and TRANSFERS the case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Roanoke Division. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 10/29/2018. (tjoh, )
October 29, 2018 Case transferred to District of Western District of Virginia, Roanoke Division. (tjoh, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Allen Lamberson. (Bender, Elliott)
October 26, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David Allen Lamberson. (Bender, Elliott)
October 26, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative Motion to Transfer Venue filed by David Allen Lamberson. (Bender, Elliott)
October 26, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Change Venue , #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative Motion to Transfer Venue, #20 First MOTION to Transfer Case filed by David Allen Lamberson. (Bender, Elliott)
October 17, 2018 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Stephen D. Bear, Rhonda Vaught, Wythe County. (Harf, Julian)
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Change Venue by Stephen D. Bear, Rhonda Vaught, Wythe County. (Harf, Julian)
October 17, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian F. Harf on behalf of Stephen D. Bear, Rhonda Vaught, Wythe County (Harf, Julian)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Upon reviewing the complaint, the Court questions whether venue is proper in Richmond. Some defendants have moved to transfer venue, and the plaintiff has 14 days to respond to those motions. If any other party wants to address whether venue is proper in this Court, the Court DIRECTS them to file a brief statement on the issue by October 26, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/17/2018. (tjoh, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen D. Bear, Rhonda Vaught, Wythe County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Guynn, Jim)
October 12, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for Summary Judgment by Stephen D. Bear, Rhonda Vaught, Wythe County. (Guynn, Jim)
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 Response filed by Crystal Vaught. (Warburton, Roy)
October 12, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy David Warburton on behalf of Crystal Vaught (Warburton, Roy)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 First MOTION to Transfer Case by Gerald E. Mabe, II. (Keuling-Stout, Henry)
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 PLEASE DISREGARD: RESPONSE in Support re #16 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerald E. Mabe, II. (Keuling-Stout, Henry) Modified on 10/12/2018 to correct docket entry(tjoh, ).
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #16 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerald E. Mabe, II. (Keuling-Stout, Henry)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 PLEASE DISREGARD: REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gerald E. Mabe, II. (Keuling-Stout, Henry) Modified on 10/12/2018 to correct docket entry (tjoh, ).
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gerald E. Mabe, II. (Keuling-Stout, Henry)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rick Arnold, Jennifer Brewster, Dewey Clemons, Jr, Misty E. Dalton, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Joel Hash, Wayne C. Sutherland, Town of Wytheville, Wytheville Police Department. (Stallard, William)
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rick Arnold, Jennifer Brewster, Dewey Clemons, Jr, Misty E. Dalton, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Joel Hash, Wayne C. Sutherland, Town of Wytheville, Wytheville Police Department. (Stallard, William)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Rick Arnold, Jennifer Brewster, Dewey Clemons, Jr, Misty E. Dalton, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Joel Hash, Wayne C. Sutherland, Town of Wytheville, Wytheville Police Department. (Stallard, William)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative Motion to Transfer Venue by Rick Arnold, Jennifer Brewster, Dewey Clemons, Jr, Misty E. Dalton, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Joel Hash, Wayne C. Sutherland, Town of Wytheville, Wytheville Police Department. (Stallard, William)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Akers.(Jones, Randy)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Rebecca Akers.(Jones, Randy)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by David Akers.(Jones, Randy)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Smith Keuling-Stout on behalf of Gerald E. Mabe, II (Keuling-Stout, Henry)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Rhonda Vaught. (Guynn, Jim)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wythe County. (Guynn, Jim)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Stephen D. Bear. (Guynn, Jim)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jim H. Guynn, Jr on behalf of Stephen D. Bear, Rhonda Vaught, Wythe County (Guynn, Jim)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Misty E. Dalton, Joel Hash, Wayne C. Sutherland. (tjoh, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Rick Arnold, Jennifer Brewster, Dewey Clemons, Jr, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Town of Wytheville. (tjoh, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richmond Circuit Court, case number CL17-4240 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6305275.), filed by John Doe 1, Town of Wytheville, Rick Arnold, Wytheville Police Department, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jennifer Brewster, Dewey Clemons, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamberson v. Wytheville Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Wythe County, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald E. Mabe, II
Represented By: Henry Smith Keuling-Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot S. Farthing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Arnold
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Vaught
Represented By: Roy David Warburton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Akers
Represented By: Randy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.G. 'Gene' Horney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wythe County
Represented By: Julian F. Harf
Represented By: Jim H. Guynn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wytheville Police Department
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Bear
Represented By: Julian F. Harf
Represented By: Jim H. Guynn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cellell Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Hash
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty E. Dalton
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Houseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Brewster
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coy L. McRoberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Wytheville
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne C. Sutherland
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Akers
Represented By: Randy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Vaught
Represented By: Julian F. Harf
Represented By: Jim H. Guynn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Akers
Represented By: Randy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey Clemons, Jr.
Represented By: William Bradford Stallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Saliba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Lamberson
Represented By: Elliott Bruce Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?