United States Of America v. $47,048.00 in Funds from Wells Fargo Account #2026873485 et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: $40,005.11 in Funds from Bank of America Account #435036242533 and $47,048.00 in Funds from Wells Fargo Account #2026873485
Case Number: 3:2018cv00682
Filed: October 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2018 Filing 5 Verified Claim for Seized Property by Zeljko Stjepanovic. (sbea, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER by Zeljko Stjepanovic re: #1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM. (sbea, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States Of America -Proof of Service (Execution of Warrant for Arrest In Rem) (Attachments: #1 Receipt -Process Receipt and Returns)(Lee, Janet)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT for Arrest In Rem issued. (Arrest Warrants in rem and four certified copies of Complaint for Forfeiture in rem forwarded to U.S. Attorney's Office) (smej, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/10/2018 with correct case number) (smej, ). Modified on 10/10/2018 (smej, ).
October 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $40,005.11 in Funds from Bank of America Account #435036242533, and $47,048.00 in Funds from Wells Fargo Account #2026873485, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter) (smej, ). Clerk replaced main document on 10/10/2018 with corrected case number. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 10/10/2018 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. $47,048.00 in Funds from Wells Fargo Account #2026873485 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $40,005.11 in Funds from Bank of America Account #435036242533
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $47,048.00 in Funds from Wells Fargo Account #2026873485
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Janet Jin Ah Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?