Parshall v. Access National Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Paul Parshall
Defendant: Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Access National Corporation, J. Randolph Babbitt, John C. Lee, IV, Michael G. Anzilotti, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Gary D. LeClair, Thomas M. Kody, Martin S. Friedman, Union Bankshares Corporation, Childs F. Burden and Robert C. Shoemaker
Case Number: 3:2018cv00862
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OF DEFENDANT ACCESS NATIONAL CORPORATION AND INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS (ECF No. #2 ) and DEENDANT UNION BANKSHARES CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. #11 ) are denied as moot. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/10/2019. (sbea, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Parshall (Browne, David)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Mark Putnam Gimbel appointed for Union Bankshares Corporation. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/2/2019. (jsmi, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service re #7 Notice of Appearance, by Brooke Kelley Conkle on behalf of Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Conkle, Brooke)
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service re #6 Notice of Appearance, by Harrison Scott Kelly on behalf of Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Kelly, Harrison)
January 2, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service re #5 Notice of Appearance, by David Neal Anthony on behalf of Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Anthony, David)
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alan Durrum Wingfield on behalf of Access National Corporation (Wingfield, Alan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service re #3 Memorandum in Support, by Alan Durrum Wingfield on behalf of Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Wingfield, Alan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Alan Durrum Wingfield on behalf of Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Wingfield, Alan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case by Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Wingfield, Alan). Modified docket text on 12/27/2018 (sbea, ).
December 26, 2018 Notice of Correction (Amended); Clerk called filing attorney's office and spoke with an assistant to the attorneys, the "Certificate of Service" were not included with the following documents: #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Access National Corporation, #3 Memorandum in Support re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Access National Corporation, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement; the Notice of Appearance for documents #5 , #6 , and #7 . Clerk requested that the "Certificate of Service" be filed as a separate document and link it back to the documents that it was omitted from. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 12/26/2018 (sbea, ).
December 24, 2018 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Union Bankshares Corporation. (Sepulveda, Jazzirelle)
December 24, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Union Bankshares Corporation. (Sepulveda, Jazzirelle)
December 24, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Bankshares Corporation. (Sepulveda, Jazzirelle)
December 24, 2018 Filing 9 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark P. Gimbel and Certification of Local Counsel Jazzirelle Sepulveda Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6420945. by Union Bankshares Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice- Mark P. Gimbel)(Sepulveda, Jazzirelle)
December 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jazzirelle Sepulveda on behalf of Union Bankshares Corporation (Sepulveda, Jazzirelle)
December 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke Kelley Conkle on behalf of Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Conkle, Brooke)
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Scott Kelly on behalf of Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Kelly, Harrison)
December 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Neal Anthony on behalf of Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker (Anthony, David)
December 24, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Access National Corporation. (Wingfield, Alan)
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wingfield, Alan)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Access National Corporation, Michael G. Anzilotti, J. Randolph Babbitt, Childs F. Burden, Michael W. Clarke, John W. Edgemond, Martin S. Friedman, Thomas M. Kody, Gary D. LeClair, John C. Lee, IV, Mary Leigh McDaniel, Janet A. Neuharth, Robert C. Shoemaker. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A Proposed Order )(Wingfield, Alan). Modified attachment label name on 12/26/2018 (sbea, ).
December 14, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint for Violation of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6407037), filed by Paul Parshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Browne, David). Modified docket text on 12/14/2018 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parshall v. Access National Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Leigh McDaniel
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet A. Neuharth
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access National Corporation
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Randolph Babbitt
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Lee, IV
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Anzilotti
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Clarke
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Edgemond
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D. LeClair
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Kody
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin S. Friedman
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Bankshares Corporation
Represented By: Mark Putnam Gimbel
Represented By: Jazzirelle Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Childs F. Burden
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Shoemaker
Represented By: Harrison Scott Kelly
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Represented By: Brooke Kelley Conkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Parshall
Represented By: David Gerard Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?