Mejia et al v. Brannan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JULIO JOSE MALDONADO RODRIGUES, DENNIS JEOVANY CEDILLO CASTRO, DANIRA ALEJANDRA MONZON LOPEZ, DIONISIO RIVERA, NOLBERTO BUESO RODRIGUEZ, JOEL DE JESUS RODAS CASTRO, MAXIMO GRAVES, RAMON ANTONIO MEJIA and Nolberto Bueso Rodrigues
Defendant: TRUSTFORTE GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC., JV CONTRACTORS, LLC, BRANNAN,INC DBA F. RICHARD WILTON CONTRACTOR, Trustforte General Contractors, Inc, Brannan, Inc. and JV Contractors LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00010
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Notice of Correction re #4 Waiver of: Clerk has notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for service documents. The filing user is requested to file the original Waiver of Service of Summons (on paper) with the Clerk's Office. (smej, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brannan, Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (smej, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 (SEE DOCKET ENTRY #5 ) Waiver of the Service of Summons as to Defendant Brannan, Inc. by Ramon Antonio Mejia (Greenberg, Gregg) Modified docket text on 2/19/2019 (smej, ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brannan, Inc., JV Contractors LLC, and Trustforte General Contractors, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
January 8, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (smej, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Ramon Antonio Mejia, Maximo Graves, Joel De Jesus Rodas Castro, Julio Jose Maldonado Rodrigues, Danira Alejandra Monzon Lopez, Nolberto Bueso Rodrigues, Dennis Jeovany Cedillo Castro, and Dionisio Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement) (Greenberg, Gregg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-6434927), filed by Ramon Antonio Mejia, Maximo Graves, Joel De Jesus Rodas Castro, Julio Jose Maldonado Rodrigues, Danira Alejandra Monzon Lopez, Nolberto Bueso Rodrigues, Dennis Jeovany Cedillo Castro, and Dionisio Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greenberg, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia et al v. Brannan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUSTFORTE GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JV CONTRACTORS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANNAN,INC DBA F. RICHARD WILTON CONTRACTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustforte General Contractors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brannan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JV Contractors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIO JOSE MALDONADO RODRIGUES
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS JEOVANY CEDILLO CASTRO
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIRA ALEJANDRA MONZON LOPEZ
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIONISIO RIVERA
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOLBERTO BUESO RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL DE JESUS RODAS CASTRO
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXIMO GRAVES
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMON ANTONIO MEJIA
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolberto Bueso Rodrigues
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?