Henderson v. America

Plaintiff: Sylvia D Henderson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00028
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671mv
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate Reporting Service. United States of America served on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (jsmi, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sylvia D Henderson (Toepp, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to United States Attorney. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically reissued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Sylvia D Henderson. (Toepp, Christopher) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/18/2019) (jsmi, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General ONLY. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Sylvia D Henderson. (Toepp, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6439078.), filed by Sylvia D Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Toepp, Christopher) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/10/2019) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia D Henderson
Represented By: Christopher Jamieson Toepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?