G. H. an Infant v. United States of America

Plaintiff: G. H.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00029
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Referring Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671mv
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 RE-ISSUED SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney. (Attachment: #1 Letter). (sbea, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Acting Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachment: #1 Letter). (sbea, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate Reporting Service by United States of America. United States of America served on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (sbea, )
January 25, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. District Judge M. Hannah Lauck no longer assigned to the case. (jsmi, )
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign this case to the Honorable Henry E. Hudson, United States District Judge. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 1/25/2019. (jsmi, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by G. H. (Toepp, Christopher)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to United States Attorney. (Attachment: #1 Letter). (sbea, )
January 17, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #5 Re-Issued Summons as to USA; Attorney was requested to return the Unexecuted Summons issued to the USA to the Clerk's Office. (sbea, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons RE-ISSUED as to the U.S. Attorney with the correct service address. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove headers and print out two copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Serve one copy of the summons and one copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the additional copy of the summons for the Defendant (executed or unexecuted) on paper to the Clerk's Office. (sbea, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re: #1 Complaint by G. H. (Toepp, Christopher). Clerk replaced Proposed Summons with correct service address per filing attorney on 1/17/2019). NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 1/17/2019 (sbea, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove headers and print out two copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Serve one copy of the summons and one copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the additional copy of the summons for the Defendant (executed or unexecuted) on paper to the Clerk's Office. (sbea, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by G. H.. (Toepp, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #1 Complaint, Filing attorney was notified of proper filing procedures for submitting the Initial Complaint. Attorney was requested to file the "Proposed Summons" as a separate docket entry. No other action is required at this time. (sbea, )
January 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (sbea, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6439148), filed by G H an Infant. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Toepp, Christopher). Clerk replaced complaint to include Civil Action Number on 1/9/2019). NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 1/9/2019 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G. H. an Infant v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. H.
Represented By: Christopher Jamieson Toepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?