Midlothian Enterprises, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Midlothian Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00051
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The Court held an initial pretrial conference in this case on March 13, 2019. As announced at the conference, the parties shall file motions for summary judgment by August 23, 2019. Additionally, the parties shall complete all discovery by June 28, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 03/13/2019. (smej, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Simpson Garrett on behalf of Owners Insurance Company (Garrett, Thomas)
March 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/13/2019. (wtuc)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Midlothian Enterprises, Inc.. (Conrad, John)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 09:05 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 1/28/19. (Attachment: #1 Electronic Device Authorization form for counsel not listed in scheduling order)(wtuc)
January 23, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (jsmi, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Owners Insurance Company. (jsmi, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Owners Insurance Company.(Miller, Laura) (Main Document 3 replaced to include case number on 1/23/2019) (jsmi, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT re #1 Notice of Removal by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Miller, Laura) Modified to correct docket text on 1/23/2019 (jsmi, ).
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6456819.), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Laura) Modified to correct docket and attachments on 1/23/2019 (jsmi, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/23/2019) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midlothian Enterprises, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Stanley Paul Wellman
Represented By: Laura Lee Miller
Represented By: Thomas Simpson Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midlothian Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: John Anthony Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?