Mutual Assurance Society of Virginia v. GEICO Marine Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Mutual Assurance Society of Virginia
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company and GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00061
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether all parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. See 28 U.S.C. 636. To that end, counsel for the defendant shall ensure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than April 8, 2019, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. on April 8, 2019, whether such consents (by all parties) have been given. Counsel for each party shall file, not later than 5:00 p.m. on April 8, 2019, a Statement Regarding Consent clearly articulating whether or not the party will consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction.. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/25/19. (khan, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/25/19. (khan, )
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT GEICO MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. Finding Plaintiff Mutual Assurance Society of Virginia's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal proper pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Court acknowledges the dismissal without prejudice of Defendant GEICO Marine Insurance Company, who shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees in this matter. The action shall proceed against Defendant Federal Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 2/21/2019. (jsmi, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Applying Only to GEICO Marine Insurance Company by Mutual Assurance Society of Virginia (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinman, Justin)
January 28, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6462174.), filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Answer, #4 Exhibit C Party Corporate Information, #5 Exhibit D RCC filed NOR, #6 Exhibit Financial Disclosure)(Winegardner, Douglas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/28/2019) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutual Assurance Society of Virginia v. GEICO Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas Aaron Winegardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mutual Assurance Society of Virginia
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Represented By: Harold Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?