Pleasant v. Clarke et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Pleasant
Defendant: Harold W. Clarke, Wendy K. Brown and Karen D. Brown
Case Number: 3:2019cv00417
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER that: (1) This action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; (2) Within 30 days, Plaintiff must submit a statement under oath or under penalty of perjury that (please see Memorandum Order for additional information); (3) The Clerk shall obtain a certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account for the six month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; (4) Plaintiff must affirm his intention to pay the entire $350.00 filing fee. Accordingly, he is required to read, sign, and return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days; and, (5) Failure to comply strictly with any of the above time requirements will result in summary dismissal of the action (please see Memorandum Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 08/02/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff with Consent to Collections of Fees form and IFP Affidavit. Letter and Inmate Account Report Form mailed to United States Prison Lee. (walk ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Karen D. Brown, Wendy K. Brown, Harold W. Clarke, by Jeffrey A. Pleasant. (tjoh, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen D. Brown, Wendy K. Brown, Harold W. Clarke, filed by Jeffrey A. Pleasant. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Attachment, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Envelope)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pleasant v. Clarke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold W. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Pleasant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?