Parker, Ed.D. v. Lancaster County School Board et al
Plaintiff: Steven D. Parker, Ed.D.
Defendant: Kenya Moody, Lancaster County School Board, Carolyn Young and Audrey Thomasson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00436
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kenya Moody. (Royer, Jennifer)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Reply to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Reply Brief in Support filed by Audrey Thomasson. (Capps, Jeremy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Steven D. Parker, Ed.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thorsen, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Steven D. Parker, Ed.D.. (Thorsen, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Steven D. Parker, Ed.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thorsen, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carolyn Young. (Protogyrou, Andrew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Carolyn Young.(Protogyrou, Andrew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kenya Moody. (Royer, Jennifer)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kenya Moody. (Royer, Jennifer)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Lancaster County School Board.(Capps, Jeremy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Support to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Audrey Thomasson. (Capps, Jeremy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Audrey Thomasson. (Capps, Jeremy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven D. Parker, Ed.D. as to Lancaster County School Board, Kenya Moody, Audrey Thomasson, Carolyn Young: All served on 06/18/2019; Date Answer Due: 07/09/2019 (Thorsen, James) Modified on 7/5/2019 to add service and answer date. (tjoh, ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lancaster County School Board, Kenya Moody, Audrey Thomasson, Carolyn Young. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
June 12, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (tjoh, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Steven D. Parker, Ed.D.. (Thorsen, James)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6687627.), filed by Steven D. Parker, Ed.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Thorsen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker, Ed.D. v. Lancaster County School Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenya Moody
Represented By: Jennifer Dillow Royer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County School Board
Represented By: Jeremy David Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Young
Represented By: Andrew Anthony Protogyrou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Thomasson
Represented By: Jeremy David Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D. Parker, Ed.D.
Represented By: James Broome Thorsen
Represented By: Jesse Andrew Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?