Smith v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rhonda Smith
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00451
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhonda Smith. CSX Transportation, Inc. waiver sent on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Appleton, Randall)
June 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6699196.), filed by Rhonda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Appleton, Randall) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/20/2019) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Smith
Represented By: Randall Eugene Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?