Watson v. Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Plaintiff: Sheniqua L. Watson
Defendant: Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00466
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Sheniqua L. Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16 (not numbered but in chronological order), #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31 (2 documents marked exhibit 31), #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 34 part 1, #34 Exhibit 34 part 2, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Certification, #49 Certificate of Service* Clerk found no Exhibit Numbered 33, although there were 2 exhibits marked Exhibit 31 and Clerk docketed them together).(tjoh, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Flynn Robb on behalf of Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services (Robb, Sarah)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kincer, E.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services. (Kincer, E.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019 (tjoh, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services. Clerk placed in USM box for service. (Attachments: #1 USM Form) (smej, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 07/09/2019. (smej, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services, filed by Sheniqua L. Watson. (Attachments: #1 Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Letter, #3 Local Rule 83.1) (smej, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Upon due consideration, the Court FINDS the plaintiff unable to pay the costs of proceeding in this case. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion #1 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to docket the complaint and to issue summons upon the defendant. The Court DIRECTS the U.S. Marshals Service to serve the defendant with the summons and a copy of the complaint. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 07/09/2019. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (smej, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Sheniqua L. Watson. (smej, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sheniqua L. Watson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (RECEIVED), #2 Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Letter, #4 Local Rule 83.1) (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Dept. of Agriculture and Consumer Services
Represented By: E. Lewis Kincer, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Flynn Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheniqua L. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?