Twombly v. Coastal Credit, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Matthew Richard Arnold Twombly
Defendant: Coastal Credit, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00474
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Coastal Credit, L.L.C.. (Anthony, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Coastal Credit, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Anthony, David)
July 18, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #4 ; the filing user is reminded to include the original summons as the first page when filing a "Return on Service" or an "Affidavit of Service." The docket entry has been corrected. (walk, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Richard Arnold Twombly. Coastal Credit, L.L.C. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Kennedy, Emily). Corrected docket entry on 07/18/2019. (walk, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coastal Credit, L.L.C.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
June 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (walk, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Matthew Richard Arnold Twombly. (Kennedy, Emily)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint filed by Matthew Richard Arnold Twombly against Coastal Credit, L.L.C. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6712607). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Kennedy, Emily). Modified docket entry on 06/27/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twombly v. Coastal Credit, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Credit, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Neal Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Richard Arnold Twombly
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Relyea
Represented By: Mark Clifton Leffler
Represented By: Emily Connor Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?