Wilson v. Greenwich Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Wilson
Defendant: Aaron's Inc., Greenwich Insurance Company, Cynthia Fegley, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00489
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Morrel Hance on behalf of Greenwich Insurance Company (Hance, Katherine)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal Exhibit 1, Plaintiff's State Court Complaint by Dennis Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit pursuant to Va. Code Sec. 8.01-6)(Yakubisin, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 9:05 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Aaron's Inc..(Lewis, Lindsey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Parks, Edward)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Greenwich Insurance Company.(Parks, Edward)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Rollins, Lindsay)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Becker Mumford, Jr on behalf of Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Mumford, John)
July 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsau, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Rollins, Lindsay)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6721644.), filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rollins, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Greenwich Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron's Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward Brian Parks, II
Represented By: Katherine Morrel Hance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Fegley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Represented By: Lindsay Lankford Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Wilson
Represented By: John Ray Newby
Represented By: Christopher Poole Yakubisin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?