Harris v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Harris
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00493
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL ORDER that this matter is before the Court on a Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #8 ) filed by the Plaintiff pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). It appearing just and proper to do so, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/21/2019. (walk, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Kimberly Harris. (Gayle, Alfred)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond) - It appearing good cause is shown, and there being no objection by Defendant, the Motion is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until August 26,2019, to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/13/2019. (smej, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kimberly Harris. (Gayle, Alfred)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kimberly Harris. (Gayle, Alfred)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Brief in Support to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (de Witt, Alexander)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (de Witt, Alexander)
July 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (walk, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (de Witt, Alexander). Modified docket entry on 07/03/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company from the Henrico County Circuit Court, Case No. CL 19-3262. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6722381). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 and #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (de Witt, Alexander). Modified docket entry on 07/03/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Represented By: Alexander Spotswood de Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Harris
Represented By: Alfred Blake Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?