Crist v. The Dunlop House LLC
Plaintiff: Donella G Crist
Defendant: The Dunlop House LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00497
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Granting Plaintifr s Request for Counsel for Mediation Only) THIS MATTER is before the Court on a request by Plaintiff to have attorney Erika Winter represent her for mediation only. At the Pre-Trial Conference before the Court on September 5, 2019, this Court granted Plaintiffs request. It is hereby ORDERED that Erika Winter will represent Plaintiff in mediation. It is further ORDERED that the Parties contact Chambers within five (5) days of this Order to schedule mediation. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 09/06/2019. Copies delivered as directed. (tjoh, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Bench Trial set for 3/4/2020 at 9:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/6/2019) (rpiz)
September 5, 2019 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/5/2019 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Court Reporter Harding, OCR); Bench Trial set for 3/4/2020 at 9:00 AM (rpiz)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Conference by Donella G Crist. (tjoh, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Discovery Plan by The Dunlop House LLC.(Douthat, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Dunlop House LLC. (Douthat, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by The Dunlop House LLC.(Douthat, James)
July 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6727967.), filed by The Dunlop House LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Circuit Court Compaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Douthat, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crist v. The Dunlop House LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donella G Crist
Represented By: Erika Louise Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dunlop House LLC
Represented By: James Fielding Douthat, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?