Littlestone, LC et al v. Robert J. Chauvin, et al.
Plaintiff: Littlestone, LC and Chadwick Development LLC
Defendant: Chauvin, LLC, Robert J Chavin and Robert J. Chauvin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00514
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 First MOTION to Remand filed by Chadwick Development LLC, Littlestone, LC. (Robbins, C.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert J. Chauvin, Chauvin, LLC. (Gavin, Charles)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Came this day the defendants, Robert J. Chauvin and Chauvin, LLC, by counsel, and moved for additional time to file their Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. It appearing appropriate to do so, and it appearing that the Plaintiffs consent to the request, it is hereby ORDERED that Robe1t J. Chauvin and Chauvin, LLC, by counsel, shall file its Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss by August 14, 2019. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 08/12/2019. (tjoh, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Late Response by Robert J. Chauvin, Chauvin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Gavin, Charles)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that this matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff Littlestone, LC and Chadwick Development, LLC's (collectively, "Plaintiffs") Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (the "Motion") (ECF No. #10 .) Defendants Robert J. Chauvin and Chauvin, LLC (collectively, "Defendants") have not responded, though the time to do so has not expired (please see Order for additional information.) The Court will not undertake an advisory opinion process regarding jurisdiction. But recognizing that Defendants have not responded, and not wishing to delay this litigation, upon due consideration and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Motion. (ECF No. #10 .) Plaintiffs SHALL file their response to the Motion to Dismiss no later than close of business on October 1, 2019. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 08/06/2019. (walk, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 First MOTION to Dismiss 12 (b)(6), #6 Memorandum in Support by Chadwick Development LLC, Littlestone, LC. (Robbins, C.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Chadwick Development LLC, Littlestone, LC. (Robbins, C.). Modified docket entry on 08/02/2019. (walk, ).
July 30, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #7 ; the filing user is notified that the document includes two motions and is requested to refile the same document using the filing event, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. The docket text for Document #8 will be modified after the Motion to Dismiss has been filed. (walk, )
July 28, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re: #7 MOTION to Remand PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1447 and #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Chadwick Development LLC, Littlestone, LC. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit). (Robbins, C.). Modified docket entry on 08/02/2019. (walk, ).
July 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1447 by Chadwick Development LLC, Littlestone, LC. (Robbins, C.) Modified docket entry on 08/02/2019. (walk, ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss 12 (b)(6) filed by Robert J. Chauvin. (Gavin, Charles)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss 12 (b)(6) by Robert J. Chauvin. (Gavin, Charles)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Chauvin, LLC and by Robert J. Chauvin.(Gavin, Charles)
July 16, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #2 ; the filing user is reminded to file the Financial Interest Disclosure Statement separately when filing a new case. The filing event, Financial Disclosure Statement, is located under Other Documents. The document has been filed and no further action is required at this time. (walk, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Chauvin, LLC. (walk, )
July 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (walk, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Arthur Gavin on behalf of Robert J. Chauvin and Chauvin, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Financial Disclosure). (Gavin, Charles). Modified docket entry on 07/16/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by Robert J. Chauvin, Jr. and Chauvin, LLC. Case removed from the Amelia Circuit Court, Case No. CL19-241-00. (Filing Fee Paid: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-6739277). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Gavin, Charles). Modified docket entry on 07/16/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Littlestone, LC et al v. Robert J. Chauvin, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chauvin, LLC
Represented By: Charles Arthur Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Chavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Chauvin
Represented By: Charles Arthur Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Littlestone, LC
Represented By: C. Jay Robbins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick Development LLC
Represented By: C. Jay Robbins, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?