Dillard v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Kim D. Dillard
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00515
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, and Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney General, #2 Exhibit United States Attorney, #3 Exhibit Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford) Modified to correct docket text on 8/29/2019 (smej, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate Reporting Service as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (smej, )
July 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Kim D. Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons - US Attorney, #2 Exhibit Summons - Regional Counsel)(Farrell, Clifford)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint filed by Kim D. Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim D. Dillard
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?