Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC v. McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S., LLC et al
Appellant: Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC
Appellee: McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S., LLC, Old ANR, LLC and Office of the U.S. Trustee
Interested Party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00552
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Roy Theodore Englert, Jr. to appear Pro hac vice for McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S., LLC. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/12/19. (jsau, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Bankruptcy Transcript Received with Designation of Record . (jsau, ) Modified on 9/18/2019 (jtho, ).
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Transcripts received with Designation of Record. (Attachments: #1 Transcripts, #2 Transcripts)(jsau, ) Modified on 9/18/2019 (jtho, ).
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Continuation of Designation of Record, re: #9 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet with Designation of Record. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation 8 Part 2, #2 Appellant Designation 9, #3 Appellant Designation 10, #4 Appellant Designation 11, #5 Appellee Designation 1, #6 Appellee Designation 2)(jsau, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet with Designation of Record. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation 1, #2 Appellant Designation 2, #3 Appellant Designation 3, #4 Appellant Designation 4, #5 Appellant Designation 5, #6 Appellant Designation 6, #7 Appellant Designation 7)(jsau, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Roy Theodore Englert, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher L. Perkins Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6828479. by McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S., LLC. (Perkins, Christopher)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Justin James Henderson to appear Pro hac vice for Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/6/19. (jsau, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Susan Maud Freeman to appear Pro hac vice for Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/6/19.(jsau, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Justin James Henderson and Certification of Local Counsel William D. Prince IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6769049. by Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC. (Prince, William)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan Maud Freeman and Certification of Local Counsel William D. Prince IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6769048. by Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC. (Prince, William)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk regarding Local Civil Rule 83.1 mailed to Appellee McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Local Civil Rule 83.1)(jsau, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk re: Rule 8018. (Attachments: #1 Rule 8018)(jsau, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-00302-KRH, filed by Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal to Orders)(jsau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC v. McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mar-Bow Value Partners, LLC
Represented By: William Daniel Prince, IV
Represented By: David Richard Ruby
Represented By: Justin James Henderson
Represented By: Susan Maud Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: McKinsey Recovery & Transformation Services U.S., LLC
Represented By: Roy Theodore Englert, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Lawrence Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Old ANR, LLC
Represented By: Tyler Perry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Robert Breen Van Arsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?