D'Appolonia Engineering Division of Ground Technology, Inc. v. Aegis Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: D'Appolonia Engineering Division of Ground Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00568
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Court acknowledges the parties' #13 stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) and DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 9/16/2019. (jsmi, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Nanavati, Mark)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Aegis Security Insurance Company (Nanavati, Mark)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Court ORDERS that the time for Aegis to file pleadings in response to the Complaint is extended to September 12, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 9/6/2019. (jsmi, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Charles Nanavati on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Company (Nanavati, Mark)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order 1 (Proposed Order))(Jones, Gary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Jones, Gary) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/5/2019) (tjoh, ).
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Jones, Gary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Christopher Jones, Jr on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Company (Jones, Gary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by D'Appolonia Engineering Division of Ground Technology, Inc.. (Mayhew, Jonathan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D'Appolonia Engineering Division of Ground Technology, Inc. Aegis Security Insurance Company served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019 (Mayhew, Jonathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
August 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by D'Appolonia Engineering Division of Ground Technology, Inc.. (Mayhew, Jonathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6781439.), filed by D'Appolonia Engineering Division of Ground Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mayhew, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsau, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/9/2019) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Appolonia Engineering Division of Ground Technology, Inc. v. Aegis Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Appolonia Engineering Division of Ground Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Mayhew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Charles Nanavati
Represented By: Gary Christopher Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?