Biddle v. Tazewell et al
Plaintiff: Craig A. Biddle
Defendant: Tamara D. Tazewell and Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00569
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig A. Biddle. Tamara D. Tazewell waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Littel, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation. (Jebo, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Express Corporation.(Jebo, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig A. Biddle Federal Express Corporation served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Littel, David) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/27/2019) (jsau, ).
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Federal Express Corporation, Tamara D. Tazewell. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Federal Express Corporation by Craig A. Biddle. (Littel, David)
August 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsau, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Craig A. Biddle. (Littel, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6781514.), filed by Craig A. Biddle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Littel, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/9/2019) (jsau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biddle v. Tazewell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara D. Tazewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: James Rhea Jebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig A. Biddle
Represented By: David Lee Littel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?