Easton v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Easton
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Capital One, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Bank (USA) and Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00574
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of JPML Decision by Capital One, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation. re: #5 Order on Motion to Stay, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of JPML Decision)(Zinsner, Mary) Modified docket text on 10/4/2019 (jsau, ).
August 17, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation. (Zinsner, Mary). Corrected docket entry on 08/19/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Court GRANTS #3 Motion to Stay. The Court STAYS all proceedings and deadlines in these cases until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending motions to transfer and consolidate filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). The Court DIRECTS the defendants to file a status report with the Court within one (1) day of the JPML's decision on the motions to transfer and consolidate. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 8/16/2019. (jsmi, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by Capital One, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings)(Zinsner, Mary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summonses by Jessica Easton. (Surovell, Scott)
August 12, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6782963.), filed by Jessica Easton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Surovell, Scott) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/12/2019) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easton v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Easton
Represented By: Scott A. Surovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?