Gholson v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sidney Gholson
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC and Comenity Capital Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00598
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL ORDER that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant Comenity Capital Bank and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the other Defendants: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/6/2019. (jsmi, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Zachary David Miller appointed for Comenity Capital Bank. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/6/2019. (jsmi, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sidney Gholson (Keller, Tara)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Zachary David Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Rachel Ross Friedman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6819385. by Comenity Capital Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Listing of Federal Courts Admitted To)(Friedman, Rachel)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Ross Friedman on behalf of Comenity Capital Bank (Friedman, Rachel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Boen Keller on behalf of Sidney Gholson (Keller, Tara)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Sidney Gholson. (Erausquin, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6791373.), filed by Sidney Gholson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erausquin, Matthew) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/16/2019) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gholson v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Capital Bank
Represented By: Zachary David Miller
Represented By: Rachel Ross Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Gholson
Represented By: Matthew James Erausquin
Represented By: Tara Boen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?